Vedic Mathematics VS Traditional Methods

Vedic Mathematics makes mathematics more easy and fun to learn compared to the traditional methods we learn and use in our life. The traditional methods are more complex and difficult to use and apply and thus most of us starts hating Maths. With this methods and tricks, You can solve difficult maths calculations, mentally and instantantly figure out the right answer to the sum, which you were used to calculate with paper or a calculator. You will find that soon you'll start using this methods in your general life and make its Optimum use. I have tried to make all the illustrations easy to understand with help of examples and some self-exercise too..
For any doubt or help be free to leave a comment or contact us... Thanks

Easy Multiplication of numbers around 100

Multiplication of two numbers around 100 is even easier than you could ever imagine.
Suppose you want to multiply any two numbers, lets take 95 and 97 for example.
Step 1: We'll find out the difference of the two numbers (95 & 97) from 100.
              95 is 5 less than 100 [100-95=5],
               97 is 3 less than 100 [100-97=3].
Step 2: Subtract the total difference from 100. Here the total difference will be 8 [Since 5 + 3 = 8]
               So after subtracting , we get 92 [ 100 - 8 = 92 ]. This becomes first part of our answer.
Step 3: We multiply the two difference amount i.e. 5 & 3 to get 15 as the second part of our answer.

So our final answer becomes 9215. Easy isn't it ?
If you still didn't get it , here's another example for you.
Suppose you mulitiply 88 & 96.
Step 1: Difference of the two numbers ( 88 & 96 ) from 100 are 12 and 4 respectively.
Step 2: Subtracting the total difference of 16 [100- (12 + 40)] from 100 we get 84. [100 - 16 = 84]. So 84 becomes the first part of our answer.
Step 3: Now, we multiply the two difference amount of 12 & 4 to get 48 as second part of our final answer.

So the final answer becomes 8448 .
Self-Exercises:-
a) 92 x 93 =  
b) 94 x 98 =
c) 88 x 85 =
d) 87 x 99 =
Answers: a) 8556 (b) 9212 (c) 7480 (d) 8613 .

You might also like: Easy way to multiply with 5 ..

7 comments:

Abhishek Sarda April 13, 2009 at 12:53 PM  

Any suggestion or comment is welcomed from my part.

learn quran November 4, 2009 at 4:12 PM  

Nice suggestion! Thanks for sharing.

Anonymous,  February 19, 2010 at 9:31 PM  

I really like when people are expressing their opinion and thought. So I like the way you are writing

Anonymous,  February 21, 2010 at 9:28 AM  

It is useful to try everything in practise anyway and I like that here it's always possible to find something new. :)

Amit,  April 9, 2010 at 10:47 AM  

Nice blog & good post.You have beautifully maintained,
mba

Anonymous,  April 4, 2011 at 7:12 AM  

what if the second part is a three digit number?
In the self exercise question three 15X12=180. then what should we do?

siddhi April 6, 2011 at 2:02 PM  

easy to solve but any method to make easy the second part that is to be muliplied. if so pl reply at tiwari.siddhi@gmail.com

Post a Comment

Blog Widget by LinkWithin

About This Blog

Here at Easy Vedic Maths - We aim to provide Vedic Mathematics exercises and useful mathematical tricks  and assist the exercises with illustrations and self-exercises.   The only contribution we seek from our readers is to Bookmark our site to make people aware of this blog.
Thanks for Visiting Our Blog.. Do come back again..

Abhishek

| Copyright © 2010 - easyvedicmaths.blogspot.com - Easy Vedic Maths ™ |

Back to TOP