Vedic Mathematics VS Traditional Methods

Vedic Mathematics makes mathematics more easy and fun to learn compared to the traditional methods we learn and use in our life. The traditional methods are more complex and difficult to use and apply and thus most of us starts hating Maths. With this methods and tricks, You can solve difficult maths calculations, mentally and instantantly figure out the right answer to the sum, which you were used to calculate with paper or a calculator. You will find that soon you'll start using this methods in your general life and make its Optimum use. I have tried to make all the illustrations easy to understand with help of examples and some self-exercise too..
For any doubt or help be free to leave a comment or contact us... Thanks

Multiplication with 11

Multiplication with 11 looks difficult, but it is easy too , if you follow this vedic maths technique..
In order to multiply a number from 11 , You have to move from the number's unit's degit to the last digit ( i.e. from the right to left ) . You have to simply put the unit's digit as it is in the final answer, then you have to add the Unit's degit number with the number at Ten's place and put the answer (if the total of the Unit's and Ten's digit goes above 10 then you should place only the unit digit at the answer and carry the carryover Ten's digit of the answer to the next Hundred's digit and so on till you reach the last digit ) .

Theoritically its too difficult for You to understand if you don't love maths ( like 9/10 people ) ....
So, lets take some example, firstly we should take a two digit number like 35
35 x 11 = Put 5 as the unit digit of your final answer
next add "3" and "5" (as we should move in the left direction digit by digit) and put "8" as the Ten's digit of your final answer.
lastly put "3" as the hundredth and last digit of your final answer. ( this is done because you have already dealt with 5 , 5+3 and lastly 3 )
So the final answer is 385
35 x 11 = 385 ( 3 , 3+5 , 5 )



Next lets take another two digit number's example of 95 to show you a case if the total of the unit and tenth digit of the number get more than 10, here 9+5 > 10 , so here, calculation is a bit tricky.
So, we put the unit digit as the uint digit of the final answer ( as we did in the above example ) and then we add the two digit i.e 9 and 5 and put "4" as the Tenth digit of the answer ( Since, 9 + 5 = 14 , we put "4" in the tenth place of the final answer and carry 1 to further add with 9 )
Next, now we have to add the carryover of 1 with the last leftover digit of 9 and put the final answer as 1045.
This is how I did:
95 x 11 = ( 9 , 9+5 , 5 ) [ Since 9+5 = 14 we put 4 and carry 1 to add with the hundredth place number i.e. 9 )
so, 95 x 11 = ( 9 , 14 , 5)
= ( 9+1 , 4 , 5 )
= (10, 4 , 5 )
= 1045 [ Our final answer ]

Now, we should take a four digit number as our example, like 2478
So, 2478 x 11 = ( 2 , 2+4, 4+7, 7+8, 8 )
= (2 , 6 , 11 , 15 , 8 ) [here both 7+8 and 4+7 > 10, thus we'll carryover]
= (2 , 6 , 11+1, 5 , 8 ) [ we carry over the "1" from "15" to add it to "11"]
= (2 , 6 , 12 , 5 , 8)
= (2 , 6+1 , 2 , 5 ,8) [we carry over the "1" from "12" to add it to "6"]
=(2 , 7 , 2 , 5 , 8)
= 27258 [ Final Answer ]
You can do the above method in very few steps and mentally too, once you understand the concept and practise a bit.
Self-Exercises :-

a) 24 x 11 = ?
b) 56 x 11 = ?
c) 598 x 11 = ?
d) 4589 x 11 = ?
e) 732865 x 11 = ?

Be free to comment and clear your doubts in case you face any doubt .


You might also like this post: Easy way to multiply numbers around 100 ...

3 comments:

Anonymous,  April 16, 2012 at 8:49 PM  

Wow Awesome !!!

Anonymous,  September 7, 2012 at 7:57 PM  

wow it is fantastic

Anonymous,  October 7, 2012 at 4:03 PM  

thanx 4 this method

Post a Comment

Blog Widget by LinkWithin

About This Blog

Here at Easy Vedic Maths - We aim to provide Vedic Mathematics exercises and useful mathematical tricks  and assist the exercises with illustrations and self-exercises.   The only contribution we seek from our readers is to Bookmark our site to make people aware of this blog.
Thanks for Visiting Our Blog.. Do come back again..

Abhishek

| Copyright © 2010 - easyvedicmaths.blogspot.com - Easy Vedic Maths ™ |

Back to TOP